THE FREDDIE ROBERTS MEMORIAL TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AWARDS MADE TO ORGANISATIONS FOR THE PROMOTION OF ENGINEERING AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF ENGINEERING APPRENTICES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 01 June 1977: Standard registration
- THE FREDDIE ROBERTS TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN HOGG | Chair | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hogg | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.44k | £2.72k | £3.00k | £2.55k | £2.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.67k | £1.20k | £1.61k | £2.20k | £900 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH MARCH 1977
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT AND DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF ENGINEERING.2. THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, PRIZES AND AWARDS FOR THE PROPAGATION OR ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE LAST MENTIONED PURPOSE AMONGST ENGINEERING APPRENTICES EMPLOYED IN THE STEEL INDUSTRY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND STUDYING IN THE COURCE OF THEIR EMPLOYMENT.3. THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN GENERAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Guy Williams Layton Llp
Pacific Chambers
11-13 Victoria Street
LIVERPOOL
L2 5QQ
- Phone:
- 01512367171
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window