IBEX
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IBEX makes connections between the Churches and the economic world, to contribute to the local and wider economies on behalf of the Churches through chaplaincy work and through involvement in bodies such as Local Strategic Partnerships and the Voluntary Sector, and to inform and challenge the Churches on economic and related matters, encouraging the practical application of a Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Governance
- 02 June 1977: Standard registration
- 22 November 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 22 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1185226 IBEX - CHURCHES WORKING WITH THE ECONOMY
- SOUTH HAMPSHIRE INDUSTRIAL MISSION (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.77k | £22.39k | £23.18k | £23.87k | £23.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.40k | £19.86k | £23.43k | £22.41k | £21.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 29 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 31 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MARCH 1977 AS AMENDED 10 JANUARY 2001, 12 MARCH 2002, 3 DECEMBER 2008 AND 10 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH ORGANISATIONS DEALING WITH THE TRAINING OR EMPLOYMENT OF PEOPLE IN THEIR DAILY WORK IN HAMPSHIRE AND DORSET, AND IN FURTHERANCE, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, OF THE ABOVE OBJECT TO ENDEAVOUR TO INCREASE THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE WORLD OF WORK IN THE CHURCHES
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE AND DORSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window