CECIL DE SALIS SCHOLARSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects are to provide scholarships, tenable at any university, college of education or other institution of further (including professional and technical) education, to be awarded to former pupils of Bishopshalt School, in the London Borough of Hillingdon, with preference given to former pupils studying at one of the universities of Cambridge, Oxford and Reading.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 27 May 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liam McGillicuddy | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Coombs | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
LYDIA HOLLAND | Trustee |
|
||||||
GAIL BOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £993 | £1.03k | £1.32k | £1.77k | £1.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.83k | £6.58k | £5.35k | £16.31k | £5.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 July 2023 | 383 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 July 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD JULY 1943 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 2ND OCTOBER 1985
Charitable objects
PROVIDING A SCHOLARSHIP OR SCHOLARSHIPS, TO BE CALLED CECIL DE SALIS SCHOLARSHIPS, TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION TO BE AWARDED TO FORMER PUPILS OF BISHOPSHALT SCHOOL, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON, TO BE SELECTED BY THE CHAIRMAN AND THE VICE-CHAIRMAN OF THE GOVERNORS OF THE SAID SCHOOL AND THE HEADMASTER THEREOF PROVIDED THAT PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO SUCH FORMER PUPILS WHO ARE STUDYING AT ANY ONE OF THE UNIVERSITIES OF CAMBRIDGE, OXFORD AND READING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bishophalt School
Royal Lane
UXBRIDGE
Middlesex
UB8 3RF
- Phone:
- 01895233909
- Email:
- PHARRIS@BISHOPSHALT.SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window