Accounts and annual returns HARWICH ELECTRIC PALACE TRUST

Charity Number: 273567
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 February 2022 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 February 2022 110 days late
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 December 2020 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 December 2020 45 days late
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 November 2019 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 November 2019 12 days late