Financial history LEXDEN SPRINGS APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 273593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £11.83k £21.77k £19.71k £7.10k £11.34k
Total expenditure £11.15k £39.17k £7.03k £7.57k £11.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A