LEXDEN SPRINGS APPEAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We exist to benefit the students of Lexden Springs Residential Special School, their families, teachers and carers.Our largest fundraising undertaken to date was c. £100,000 for specialist playground equipment. Other significant expenditures have been to provide holidays for students and minibuses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 09 December 1977: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF LEXDEN SPRINGS (Working name)
- LEXDEN SPRINGS APPEAL FUND (Previous name)
- LEXDEN SPRINGS APPEAL FUND FOR HANDICAPPED CHILDREN (Previous name)
- LEXDEN SPRINGS FUNKY FUNDING (Previous name)
- THE GOLDEN GROVE APPEAL FUND FOR MULTIPLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard James Banham | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FULLERTON | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.83k | £21.77k | £19.71k | £7.10k | £11.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.15k | £39.17k | £7.03k | £7.57k | £11.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/10/1977 AS AMENDED ON 22/04/1980 AS AMENDED ON 23/03/1982 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 12/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 18/04/2013 as amended on 14 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND GENERAL WELFARE OF THE PUPILS AT LEXDEN SPRINGS SCHOOL COLCHESTER BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND GENERAL WELFARE AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
COLCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lexden Springs School
Winstree Road
Stanway
COLCHESTER
CO3 0PZ
- Phone:
- 01206563321
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window