HESTON COMMUNITY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parent Teacher Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hounslow
Governance
- 21 June 1977: Standard registration
- 09 January 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- HESTON PARENT STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- HESTON PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2005 | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110 | £44 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.01k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 24 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 18 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
HESTON SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window