Governing document THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LARYNGECTOMEE CLUBS
Charity Number: 273635

Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 7 MAY 1977, 2 JULY 1983 AND 17 MAY 1986 AND 23 MAY 1987 AND 7TH AUGUST 1990 AS AMENDED ON 25 JAN 2016 as amended on 28 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF LARYNGECTOMEES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.