Accounts and annual returns THE NATIONAL MODEL MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 273669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 12 August 2024 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 31 October 2023 307 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 21 March 2022 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 30 July 2021 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required