Financial history THE NATIONAL MODEL MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 273669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £250 £150 £600 £501 £602
Total expenditure £200 £0 £0 £990 £650
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A