THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR PHENYLKETONURIA (UNITED KINGDOM) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society exists to provide help and support to people with PKU and their families and carers. We continue to promote the education,medical and welfare of PKU sufferers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 June 1977: Standard registration
- THE NSPKU (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR PHENYLKETONURIA AND ALLIED DISORDERS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Thompson Thompson | Chair | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amisha Bagri | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Cassidy | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Chimiak | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Vardy | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anita MacDonald | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Graham | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Louise Noble-Nesbitt | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Skidmore | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Learoyd | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Cardy | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN NOBLE-NESBITT | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.20k | £117.64k | £90.06k | £136.65k | £158.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.71k | £93.61k | £79.81k | £114.97k | £136.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 September 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2022
(These accounts |
28 September 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 15 September 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 15 September 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH APRIL 1976, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2ND MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATIONAL MEDICAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PHENYLKETONURIA AND SIMILAR DISORDERS CONTROLLED BY DIET, TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A FUND OR FUNDS FROM WHICH TO MAKE GRANTS FOR THE PURPOSE OF FULFILING THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NSPKU (Uk) Ltd
PO Box 6046
SHEFFIELD
S12 9ET
- Phone:
- 030 3040 1090
- Email:
- info@nspku.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window