TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY(BRIGHTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Courses and study facilities in meditation and Buddhism. Yoga and tai chi. Visits to and from local schools and colleges. Information resource to the public with access to library. Day retreats and group for carers. Meditation courses designed for coping with depression and chronic pain. Open days and arts events. Celebration of Buddhist festivals. Financial support to practising Buddhists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 June 1977: Standard registration
- BRIGHTON BUDDHIST CENTRE (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE WESTERN BUDDHIST ORDER (BRIGHTON) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ronald Louis Gower | Chair | 09 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Sally Suryadaya Rawlings | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Shuddhadhara Stretton | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Shann | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Roderic-Evans | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Mcauley | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.34k | £116.90k | £93.64k | £131.68k | £169.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.92k | £201.49k | £129.62k | £144.70k | £210.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 01/08/1976 AS AMENDED ON 20/02/1978 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/2010 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2012 as amended on 03 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION; IN PARTICULAR (I) TO ENCOURAGE MEMBERS AND OTHERS TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE BUDDHA. (II) TO SUPPORT ORDAINED MEMBERS OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY AND OTHER DULY ORDAINED BUDDHISTS, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COUNCIL OF THE ASSOCIATION. (III) TO MAINTAIN CLOSE CUMMUNICATION WITH AND WORK UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST ORDER AND IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER GROUPS WITH THE SAME OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT SPECIFICALLY DEFINED BUT MAINLY IN BRIGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIGHTON BUDDHIST CENTRE
17 TICHBORNE STREET
BRIGHTON
BN1 1UR
- Phone:
- 01273 711392
- Email:
- BBcounciltrustees@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window