BARBICAN PLAYGROUP AND MOTHERS AND TODDLERS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awarded charitable status in 1977, the Barbican Playgroup provides a pre-school playgroup for up to 28 children between the ages of 2 1/2 and 5 who live or work in the City of London. Playgroup sessions run parallel to normal school terms, Monday to Friday, 9.30am to 1.00pm, with extended afternoon sessions to 2.45pm for older children on Tuesdays, Wednesdays and Thursdays for older children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- City Of London
Governance
- 20 May 1977: Standard registration
- BARBICAN PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS JANE SCOTT | Chair |
|
||||||
Claire Anstee | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.55k | £96.98k | £65.27k | £95.22k | £68.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.74k | £69.68k | £69.40k | £80.54k | £79.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 August 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 August 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1975
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY: (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS TAKE PART WHEN APPROPRIATE. (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
CITY OF LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
01 LEVEL PLAYROOM
ANDREWES HOUSE
BARBICAN
LONDON EC2
EC2Y 8AX
- Phone:
- 020 7638 2718
- Email:
- claire.anstee@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window