EPSOM CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Epsom Choral Society provides the opportunity for people of all ages to practice and learn the art of choral singing. As such they rehearse weekly, and give 4 concerts a year attracting a wide range of audience, who are interested in broadening their knowledge and understanding of choral music. The Society also works with other local charities to support their fund raising by singing in public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 June 1977: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 September 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Maria Phillips | Chair | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Lawton | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr TREVOR STAMMERS | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Patricia Lock | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Josephine Duke | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kasumi Brooker | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hamish Michael Young | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nina Kaye | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Paterson | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Steward | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Helen Margaret Page | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.37k | £19.81k | £57.86k | £64.44k | £52.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.40k | £16.39k | £43.01k | £71.12k | £58.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND MARCH 1977 AND AMENDED 2ND MAY 1979 AS AMENDED ON 23 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCT 2018 as amended on 24 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER AND ASSIST IN THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE OF THE BOROUGH OF EPSOM AND EWELL AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE STUDY AND REHEARSAL OF CHORAL AND OTHER MUSIC BY PROMOTING AND PARTICIPATING IN ITS PUBLIC PERFORMANCE, BY SUPPORTING AND TAKING PART IN MUSIC FESTIVALS AND BY OTHER ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO THAT PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF EPSOM AND EWELL AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 WOODCOTE HURST
EPSOM
KT18 7DT
- Phone:
- 07808579650
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window