THE MARTLESHAM COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To enhance the quality of life for the parishioners of Martlesham and people in nearby parishes by the provision and improvement of recreational facilities and the general improvement of the environment. 2. To work with statutary and non-statutary bodies in pursuit of the above aim. 3. To foster community spirit in the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 18 July 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurence Walter Burrows | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE BRUCE | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANCIS MAUREEN BURROWS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JACQUELINE BEAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SONYA ELAINE BURROWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49 | £13 | £3 | £32 | £44 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.29k | £10.25k | £278 | £6.26k | £243 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH SEPTEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MARTLESHAM AND DISTRICT BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN ADVANCING EDUCATION, PROTECTION OF HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS, OR IN PURSUING ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
MARTLESHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 SQUIRES LANE
MARTLESHAM HEATH
IPSWICH
IP5 3UG
- Phone:
- 01473625196
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window