FRIENDS OF WOODHOUSE COLLEGE
Charity number: 273771
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 05 July 1977: Standard registration
- 29 July 2002: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- THE WOODHOUSE COLLEGE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH MARCH 1970 AS AMENDED 28TH OCTOBER 1970, 2ND OCTOBER 1978, 5TH OCTOBER 1981 AND 15TH OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.