Financial history THE SOCIETY FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY

Charity number: 273795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.48m £2.60m £3.12m £2.57m £2.88m
Total expenditure £2.11m £1.60m £2.32m £2.20m £2.70m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.43m £2.57m £3.06m £2.52m £2.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £48.02k £28.56k £56.83k £57.88k £116.97k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.09m £1.58m £2.29m £2.17m £2.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.23k £14.74k £35.34k £33.47k £34.48k
Expenditure - Governance £59.32k £61.36k £79.24k £73.51k £82.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £64.06k £13.32k £27.52k £73.20k £90.26k
Expenditure - Investment management £13.06k £13.46k £35.04k £29.11k £34.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0