Accounts and annual returns THE LEATHERHEAD MUSEUM AND HERITAGE CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 273798
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 12 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 26 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required