LORETO PARENTS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 273801
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School fund raising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income: £3,974
Total expenditure: £2,611
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Hertfordshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 23 June 1977: Standard registration
- 20 October 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- LORETO COLLEGE PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.50k | £14.86k | £7.28k | £4.03k | £3.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.34k | £13.21k | £2.65k | £6.79k | £2.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 20 MAY 1977
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF LORETO COLLEGE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window