THE TOLKIEN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public in, and promote research into, the life and works of Professor John Ronald Reul Tolkien CBE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 July 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAUN GUNNER | Chair | 26 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
Jeremy Scott Edmonds | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Neil Sheppard Anderson | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Hannah McDonald | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
William James SHERWOOD | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Niamh-Elizabeth Riordain | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PENELOPE ANNE HAWARD | Trustee | 11 April 2015 |
|
|||||||
Daniel Helen | Trustee | 11 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.92k | £101.39k | £196.49k | £216.70k | £305.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.13k | £93.23k | £117.89k | £151.28k | £239.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 December 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 December 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH MAY 1977 AS AMENDED 6 APRIL 2002, APRIL 2003 AND APRIL 2007. AS AMENDED ON 22 APR 2017 as amended on 06 Apr 2019 as amended on 18 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN, AND PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO, THE LIFE AND WORKS OF PROFESSOR JOHN RONALD REVEL TOLKIEN, CBE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Tithe Barn
Merton
Bicester
OX25 2NF
- Phone:
- 01865331294
- Email:
- treasurer@tolkiensociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window