THE ARUNDELL STREET FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No activities for over a decade
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 19 July 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Westminster City Council | Trustee | 01 April 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 7TH MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF THE AGED IMPOTENT AND POOR INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER; 2. THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AMONG THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3. THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE) OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; 4. THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 5. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (WHETHER OR NOT OF A NATURE SIMILAR TO ANY OF THOSE HEREINBEFORE SPECIFIED) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
5th Floor
Corporate Finance
WESTMINSTER CITY HALL
5 Strand
LONDON
WC2N 5HR
- Phone:
- 02076411379
- Email:
- rtailor@westminster.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window