BRITISH MOTOR SPORTS TRAINING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Trust inter alia are to provide the funds for education and training in techniques to prevent and reduce the incidence and gravity of accidents in motor sport
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 July 1977: Standard registration
- BRITISH MOTORSPORT TRUST (Working name)
- RAC BRITISH MOTOR SPORTS TRAINING TRUST (Previous name)
- RAC/ACU BRITISH MOTOR SPORTS TRAINING TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roderick Kenworthy Parkin | Chair | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP FOSTER | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Bertram Chambers | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC OSTROWSKI | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jim Morris | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR NICKY MOFFITT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.71k | £115.67k | £129.66k | £136.15k | £143.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £374.14k | £300.10k | £259.00k | £452.30k | £521.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19/05/1977 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/1980 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/04/1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08 NOV 2016 as amended on 03 Nov 2020 as amended on 16 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROVISION OF MAINTENANCE MEDICAL TREATMENT DRUGS MEDICAL APPLIANCES SICKNESS AND FUNERAL BENEFITS CLOTHING HOUSING FOOD REHABILITATION (INCLUDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING) AND GENERAL RELIEFAMON AND FOR SUCH DESERVING POOR AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS INJURED IN MOTOR VEHICLE OR MOTOR CYCLE RACING TRIALS AND COMPETITIONS OR THE ORGANISATION OR PROMOTION THEREOF AS ARE SPECIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH MAY 1977 (SUCH PERSONS BEING HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE INTENDED BENEFICIARIES") AND THE DESERVING POOR AND NECESSITOUS WIVES WIDOWS CHILDREN OR DEPENDANTS OF ANY INTENDED BENEFICIARIES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF DECLARATION OF TRUS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Tan Y Bryn Road
LLANDUDNO
LL30 1UU
- Phone:
- 01753765000
- Email:
- gensec@bmstt.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window