Governing document BRITISH MOTOR SPORTS TRAINING TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19/05/1977 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/1980 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/04/1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08 NOV 2016 as amended on 03 Nov 2020 as amended on 16 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROVISION OF MAINTENANCE MEDICAL TREATMENT DRUGS MEDICAL APPLIANCES SICKNESS AND FUNERAL BENEFITS CLOTHING HOUSING FOOD REHABILITATION (INCLUDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING) AND GENERAL RELIEFAMON AND FOR SUCH DESERVING POOR AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS INJURED IN MOTOR VEHICLE OR MOTOR CYCLE RACING TRIALS AND COMPETITIONS OR THE ORGANISATION OR PROMOTION THEREOF AS ARE SPECIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH MAY 1977 (SUCH PERSONS BEING HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE INTENDED BENEFICIARIES") AND THE DESERVING POOR AND NECESSITOUS WIVES WIDOWS CHILDREN OR DEPENDANTS OF ANY INTENDED BENEFICIARIES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF DECLARATION OF TRUS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.