Financial history FRIENDS OF THE WESTERN BUDDHIST ORDER (SURLINGHAM)

Charity number: 273850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £220.22k £236.18k £363.62k £377.23k £464.67k
Total expenditure £182.67k £206.01k £273.45k £320.01k £318.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A