Trustees THE WORLINGWORTH COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 273866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chloe Cross Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Tessa Bell Trustee 03 July 2023
None on record
Chantelle Love Trustee 11 April 2022
None on record
Amanda Jane Porter Trustee 11 April 2022
None on record
Simon John Burgin Trustee 14 January 2021
None on record
MELANIE FARROW Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record