QDG HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Museum exhibition has now been incoroprated into the new Firing Line Museum at Cardiff Castle. Research and conservation has continued throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 July 1977: Standard registration
- 1ST THE QUEEN'S DRAGOON GUARDS REGIMENTAL MUSEUM (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN DENIS BEATSON-HIRD | Chair |
|
||||||
Major Robert Courtney Mansel | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Dennis | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Laurence Hawtin | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Howard Smith | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIGADIER ALAN RICHMOND OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.64k | £37.74k | £23.28k | £12.85k | £15.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.47k | £46.53k | £32.03k | £6.33k | £15.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST MAY 1977 AS AMENDED FEBRUARY 2011 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24 MAY 2023 as amended on 15 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO UPHOLD THE TRADITIONS OF THE REGIMENT AND PERPETUATE ITS DEEDS BY ACQUIRING, ACCOMMODATING, MANAGING, AND PRESERVING HERITAGE ASSETS OF HISTORICAL INTEREST IN RELATION TO THE REGIMENT (OR ITS ANTECEDENTS) AND TO PROMOTE STUDY INTO THE DEEDS, HISTORY AND TRADITIONS OF THE REGIMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOME HEADQUARTERS
1ST THE QUEENS DRAGOON GUARDS
MAINDY BARRACKS
CARDIFF
CF14 3YE
- Phone:
- 02920781227
- Email:
- aohhqqdg1959@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window