THE OXFORDSHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote agricultural efficiency by providing financial assistance for relevant activities to individuals, groups or organisations connected with agricultural/rural activities in Oxfordshire and adjoining Counties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 August 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BOB WHITE | Chair |
|
||||||
Patrick Mark Hook | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|||||
TINA BREAKSPEAR | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Florey | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Colin Badger | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Chell | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Julian Sayers | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.24k | £6.38k | £1.92k | £7.62k | £8.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.27k | £6.48k | £2.61k | £7.54k | £6.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD MAY 1977
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURAL EFFICIENCY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORPWOOD HOUSE
SCHOOL ROAD
ARDINGTON
WANTAGE
OX12 8PQ
- Phone:
- 01235862888
- Email:
- secretary@oast.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window