CHEVINGTON CHEDBURGH DEPDEN AND REDE COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administration of a community centre, the Erskine Centre, used by residents of the community, the villages of Chevington, Chedburgh, Depden & Rede, and by non-residents for dances, meetings, wedding celebrations etc. Administration of an annexe for the care and education of a pre-school organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 10 August 1977: Standard registration
- ERSKINE CENTRE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Gary Patrick Dillon | Chair | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Cengiz | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julia Groves | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Jane Smith | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Barnetson | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Colman | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANGIE BARNETSON | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.53k | £23.95k | £28.05k | £17.91k | £28.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.24k | £28.75k | £26.63k | £19.66k | £12.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £542 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.13k | N/A | £18.53k | £450 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF CHEVINGTON DEPDEN AND REDE IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CHEVINGTON, CHEDBURGH, DEPDEN AND REDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Erskine Community Centre
Chevington Road
Chedburgh
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP29 4UL
- Phone:
- 01284 850439
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window