WOODSTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This Charity was established to improve the conditions of life for the inhabitants of Woodston, Peterborough and of the surrounding areas. This is achieved by advancing education, providing recreation and leisure facilities and promoting chartiable purposes throughout the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

1 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 20 July 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA BLACKWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.03k | £31.19k | £31.15k | £25.44k | £26.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.13k | £34.36k | £23.59k | £22.38k | £21.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1208 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1208 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST APRIL 1977
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOODSTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
WOODSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODSTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
BELSIZE COMMUNITY CENTRE
CELTA ROAD
WOODSTON
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 9JD
- Phone:
- 01733893777
- Email:
- woodsonca@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window