PITSTONE AND IVINGHOE MUSEUM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Museum, basically of farming and rural life in the area, but including other displays of wider interest and appeal, and demonstrations from a wide selection of skills and crafts on open days. Open to the general public 9 days a year, see website for times and dates; open for private parties by arrangement, see website for further details. Ample free parking; ~90% wheelchair access.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 31 August 1977: Standard registration
- PITSTONE GREEN MUSEUM (Working name)
- PITSTONE LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lionel Birch | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CHAPMAN | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Marie Patschinsky | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Barber | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALLEN PETER FAIRBROTHER | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN ARTHUR MATTHEW HENRY | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY VERONICA HERRIOTT | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN AYTHAN POWELL | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON HEATON | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Jeffrey Hawkins | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT YOUNGS | Trustee | 15 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WALLIS | Trustee | 01 October 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.25k | £20.97k | £27.08k | £30.10k | £30.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.90k | £29.27k | £13.54k | £17.95k | £26.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.77k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MARCH 1977, AMENDED 25 JULY 1991, 17 MAY 2001, 14 NOVEMBER 2002, 20 FEBRUARY 2003 AND 20 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE HISTORY OF PITSTONE, IVINGHOE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE INVESTIGATION, RECORDING, PRESERVATION AND ACQUISITION OF OBJECTS OR PROPERTY OF HISTORICAL INTEREST AND BY MEANS OF PUBLIC MEETINGS, EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES AND OTHER FORMS OF INSTRUCTION AND PUBLICITY AND BY ANY OTHER MEANS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pitstone Green Museum
Vicarage Road
Pitstone
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
Bedfordshire
LU7 9EY
- Phone:
- 07944 357 715
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window