THE CHRISTOPHER EWART-BIGGS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Christopher Ewart-Biggs Memorial Trust was created in memory of the British ambassador to Ireland who was killed by the IRA in 1976. The trust awards a -ú10,000 prize for a written work that is considered to promote peace and reconciliation in Ireland,a greater understanding between the peoples of Ireland and Britain, or closer cooperation between the partners of the European Union.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 01 August 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS PAKENHAM | Chair | 02 June 1977 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard McBride | Trustee | 09 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Ewart-Biggs | Trustee | 10 January 1999 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN EWART-BIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF ROY FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA FITZGERALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.59k | £19.65k | £24.66k | £25.53k | £26.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.11k | £16.58k | £2.73k | £2.76k | £13.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 March 2025 | 311 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 February 2024 | 298 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 October 2021 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND JUNE 1977
Charitable objects
AN ANNUAL PRIZE OF AT LEAST ONE THOUSAND POUNDS IN VALUE TO THE WRITER WHOSE RECENT WORK IN ANY FORM HAS CONTRIBUTED MOST THROUGH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC TH THE REALIZATION OF ALL OR SOME OF THE FOLLOWING IDEALS TO WHICH THE LATE CHRISTOPHER EWART-BIGGS DEDICATED HIMSELF: SEE GOVERNING INSTRUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 AVONDALE PARK GARDENS
LONDON
W11 4PR
- Phone:
- 02077277624
- Email:
- thomaspakenham@eircom.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window