THE READING SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society rehearses weekly under the direction of a professional musical director in order to achieve a high standard of performance. It performs a series of public concerts at venues in the Reading area. It also organises an annual competition for Young Musicians and joint events with other musical societies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 01 August 1977: Standard registration
- RSO (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Adams | Chair | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ayton | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Beales | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Barrett | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Molly Richetta | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Coaker | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SASHA MACKAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TIM ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.54k | £2.22k | £23.45k | £29.55k | £33.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.60k | £8.38k | £23.47k | £27.38k | £31.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/06/1997 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 06/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PRACTISE AND PERFORM ORCHESTRAL MUSIC AND TO ENCOURAGE AMATEUR MUSICIANS IN ORDER TO PROMOTE MUSIC APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
READING
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Fairfax Close
Caversham
READING
RG4 6DA
- Phone:
- 07765256286
- Email:
- chairman@rso.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window