SIR ARTHUR SULLIVAN SOCIETY

Charity Number: 274022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the public in, and promote the performance of the music of, Arthur Sullivan (1842-1900) and other contemporaneous British composers by means of performances, recordings, publications, lectures and other means.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £27,377
Total expenditure: £22,615

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Australia
  • Canada
  • France
  • Germany
  • Italy
  • Japan
  • Netherlands
  • New Zealand
  • Scotland
  • Switzerland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 August 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Hartland Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Colin Jagger Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Lisa Wenmouth Trustee 01 April 2023
FARTHINGHOE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
BICESTER BUCKINGHAM BRACKLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Christopher Richardson Trustee 27 January 2014
None on record
Christopher O'Brien Trustee 27 January 2014
None on record
STEPHEN HUGH TURNBULL BA Trustee
None on record
DOREEN MARY HARRIS Trustee
None on record
WILLIAM JOHN PARRY MA MSTACA Trustee
None on record
Elaine Marie Richardson Trustee
THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF MANAGEMENT ACCOUNTANTS' BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.05k £13.16k £22.69k £17.58k £27.38k
Total expenditure £15.07k £11.82k £14.87k £11.53k £22.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Crossways
1 Tremeddan Lane
Liskeard
PL14 3DR
Phone:
07563539394