KING GEORGE'S FIELD BISLEY WITH LYPIATT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides sport and recreational facilities for the residents of Bisley and surrounding hamlets within the Parish. Primarily the pitches are used by the local football and cricket teams and by the village school. Additional outdoor basketball facilities will be provided shortly. Part of the area behind and alonside the pavilion provides a 'kiddies' playground.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 25 January 1978: Standard registration
- KING GEORGE'S FIELD BISLEY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bisley with Lypiatt Parish Council | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.19k | £1.00k | £1.08k | £500 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.95k | £4.94k | £11.68k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 28TH JULY 1936 AND CONVEYANCE DATED 9TH FEBRUARY 1937
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND TO BE PRESERVED IN PERPETUITY AS A MEMORIAL TO HIS LATE MAJESTY KING GEORGE V UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF THE KING GEORGE'S FIELD FOUNDATION.
Area of benefit
BISLEY WITH LYPIATT
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Brockley Acres
Eastcombe
STROUD
GL6 7DU
- Phone:
- 01452771089
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window