Trustees INTERNATIONAL COLLEGE OF ORIENTAL MEDICINE (UK) LIMITED
Charity Number: 274066

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Major | Chair | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Marks | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS OWEN WILLIAM INGS | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Salim Sumar | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Jinks | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Elliott | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Bennicke Edwards | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.