Trustees WYCK RISSINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 274081
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Dipple | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Jane Lanyon | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Lathe | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Ransom | Trustee | 26 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Finnimore | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Sewards | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.