THE HENRY TYNDALE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to support the needs of the children at school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 August 1977: Standard registration
- THE GRANGE SCHOOL (ALDERSHOT) ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Milan Roka | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
martin carty | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Manders | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
SALLY JOHNSON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.34k | £12.96k | £35.68k | £18.29k | £9.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.09k | £17.23k | £1.03k | £1.14k | £45.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST JUNE 1977 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NOARMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSICIATION MAY:- (A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH TH SCHOOL, AND (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Henry Tyndale School
Ship Lane
FARNBOROUGH
GU14 8BX
- Phone:
- 01252 544577
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window