ARCHBISHOP TENISON'S PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 274093
Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Archbishop Tenison's Parents' Association, ATPA exists to raise much needed funds for the school, which benefit all pupils at the school, and equally important, to create a welcoming social atmosphere to the school. Egs. Christmas Fayre, Summer Fun Days, Quiz Nights.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £496
Total expenditure: £371

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 September 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • A T P A (Working name)
  • ARCHBISHOP TENISON'S PARENT ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Brenda Beneochrist Trustee 08 December 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £6.56k £7.02k £1.62k £5 £496
Total expenditure £9.66k £5.02k £3.63k £130 £371
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 March 2022 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 April 2021 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE ATPA TREASURER
SELBORNE ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 5JQ
Phone:
02086884014
Website:

No information available