Financial history EXETER MOSQUE AND CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 274095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £140.62k £147.28k £174.01k £232.74k £222.54k
Total expenditure £156.55k £141.61k £165.56k £222.87k £237.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.58k £40.41k £8.84k £18.30k N/A