Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF GLOUCESTER TRUST FUND

Charity number: 274097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £21.26k £22.10k £26.88k £28.69k £48.47k
Total expenditure £24.79k £23.41k £26.28k £20.01k £34.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A