THE CADDINGTON RECREATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing sporting and social opportunity in the village & district of Caddington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £64,135 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 19 August 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin O'Brien | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Daren Bloor | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Sutton | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DEACOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.40k | £17.52k | £28.95k | £160.10k | £112.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.34k | £3.04k | £32.62k | £162.18k | £72.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1 | £2.50k | £116.86k | £64.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 16 MARCH 1972 AS AMENDED ON 18 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ADEQUATE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, PLAYING FIELDS, PLAYGROUNDS, COMMUITY CENTRES AND OTHER AMENITIES OF A SIMILAR CHARACTER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDING IN THE PARISH OF CADDINGTON (AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
CADDINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caddington Sports Club
Manor Road
Caddington
LUTON
LU1 4HH
- Phone:
- 01582450151
- Email:
- caddingtonclub@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window