FRINTON-ON-SEA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities to the charity are: Providing and managing a Community Centre within the Tendring District
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,700 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 06 September 1977: Standard registration
- 26 March 2021: Funds received from 283573 SILVER CIRCLE CLUB
- FRINTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- FRINTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION PRE-SCHOOL GROUP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bill Martin | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Williams | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Keevil | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert George Peters | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.01k | £74.10k | £92.10k | £146.38k | £162.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.55k | £90.88k | £107.61k | £108.46k | £177.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.15k | £30.52k | £23.00k | £1.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 April 2024 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 April 2024 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/04/1977 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/1979 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/1991 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/1994 AS AMENDED ON 24/02/1996 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/2014 as amended on 20 Oct 2021 as amended on 24 Jul 2021 as amended on 29 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TENDRING DISTRICT (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B)TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY BODY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF, SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
FRINTON-ON-SEA AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Frinton Community Association
Soken House
1 Triangle Shopping Centre
Frinton-on-Sea
CO13 0AU
- Phone:
- 01255 678332
- Email:
- info@frintonca.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window