Accounts and annual returns ONE FOUNDATION ORGANISATION

Charity number: 274155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 October 2024 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 October 2024 627 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required