THE FRAMLINGHAM AND DISTRICT LOCAL HISTORY AND PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise a series of winter lectures and summer visits associated with local history for the education of the public. We also seek to preserve historic objects and buildings. Likewise, we produce a six-monthly newsletter with articles written by members with topics of local historical interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 September 1977: Standard registration
- 29 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1128206 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Heining | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Ransom | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALISON BOWMAN | Trustee | 15 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRIDGES | Trustee | 12 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE KEASLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES WILLIAM SEELY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL RAYNER-GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £991 | £1.75k | £2.83k | £2.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £946 | £444 | £1.26k | £2.15k | £1.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED THE 19TH NOVEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
(A) TO ENCOURAGE AND FOSTER INTEREST AND RESEARCH IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE HISTORY OF ALL PERIODS OF THE HISTORIC TOWNSHIP OF FRAMLINGHAM AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT. (B) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN SUITABLE ACCOMODATION FOR ALL OBJECTS PURCHASED BY OR PRESENTED, GIVEN, BEQUEATHED OR LOANED TO OR WHICH MAY OTHERWISE COME INTO THE POSSESSION OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
FRAMLINGHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Fulchers Field
Framlingham
Woodbridge
IP13 9HT
- Phone:
- 01728 723557
- Email:
- framww2@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window