CHALVEDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ASSOCIATION CURRENTLY WORKS TO PROVIDE A BASE FOR COMUNITY ACTIVITES TO USE WE ARE STRIVING TO INCREASE THIS BY LOOKING INTO HOW THE LOCAL AUTHORITY CAN HELP US INVITE MORE GROUPS INTO THE CENTER CURRENT GROUPS INCLUDE PENSIONERS COFFEE MORNING KARATE CLUB AND OTHER SOCIAL GATHERINGS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £5,900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 10 March 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Wilson | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER PAULING | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Williamson | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayla Macdonald | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Peters | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Scott Peters | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mason Peters | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marion Pile | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bracknell | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PILE | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE SMITH | Trustee | 27 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.89k | £22.15k | £18.81k | £23.22k | £24.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.63k | £15.30k | £23.11k | £21.48k | £23.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.50k | N/A | £5.00k | £5.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH OCTOBER 1977 AS AMENDED 20.4.90. AS AMENDED ON 24/04/1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHALVEDON BORDERED BY WICKFORD AVENUE TO CHALVEDON SCHOOL,PITSEA ROAD FROM WICKFORD AVENUE TO ASHLYNS,TO RECTORY ROAD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION,BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES,VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS,IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTAINANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
CHALVEDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Wimbish End
Basildon
SS13 3PD
- Phone:
- 01268470016
- Email:
- chalvedon.club@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window