THE FREDRICK AND EDITH BRUNNER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Loan fund for religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 October 1977: Standard registration
- EDITH BRUNNER MACHNOSAS KALLOH LOAN SOCIETY (Working name)
- THE EDITH BRUNNER MEMORIAL FUND (Previous name)
- THE FREDRICH AND EDITH BRUNNER MEMORIAL FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC BRUNNER BSc Hons | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH AUGUST 1977
Charitable objects
APPLY THE WHOLE OF THE INCOME ON CAPITAL TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ONE OR MORE CHARITIES, CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 HAYES CRESCENT
LONDON
NW11 0DG
- Phone:
- 02084586059
- Email:
- ericbrun98@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window