EARLS COLNE RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides sporting and recreational facilities to the local community. These facilities consist of two football grounds, cricket ground, four tennis courts, MUGA - multi use games area with flood lights, two squash courts and a two badminton court size sports hall. The complex also has a lounge bar and fitness suite.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,891 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 16 September 1977: Standard registration
- EARLS COLNE RECREATION CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Esme Hilary Emerson | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Caroline Emma Wootton | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Kelly McGibney | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Thompson - Arnold | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Tony Paul Smith | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gill Mccubbine | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
duncan mccubbine | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Cooney ACA | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.08k | £215.30k | £255.50k | £209.06k | £300.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.39k | £116.25k | £166.07k | £214.31k | £257.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £85.12k | £46.18k | £26.59k | £4.60k | £6.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 24TH AUGUST 1977 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED ON 13 JAN 2020 as amended on 24 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
To provide and assist in the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure activities for the inhabitants of Parish of Earls Colne in the County of Essex (??the area of benefit?) and other persons living in the vicinity of that Parish and the surrounding area in the interest of social welfare and with the object of improving their conditions of life through the provision and maintenance of a Playing Field, Recreation Ground and Pavilion. To further or benefit the residents of Parish of Earls Colne in the County of Essex (??the area of benefit?) and other persons living in the vicinity of that Parish and the surrounding area, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions by associating together the said residents and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the residents.
Area of benefit
EARLS COLNE, ESSEX AND VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
EARLS COLNE RECREATION CLUB
HALSTEAD ROAD
EARLS COLNE
COLCHESTER
CO6 2NG
- Phone:
- 01787223584
- Email:
- info@ecrc.club
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window