Trustees EARLS COLNE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 274292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Esme Hilary Emerson Trustee 03 September 2024
EARLS COLNE RECREATION CHARITY
Recently registered
Caroline Emma Wootton Trustee 03 September 2024
EARLS COLNE RECREATION CHARITY
Recently registered
Kelly McGibney Trustee 03 September 2024
None on record
Zoe Thompson - Arnold Trustee 01 August 2024
EARLS COLNE RECREATION CHARITY
Recently registered
Tony Paul Smith Trustee 25 October 2023
None on record
Gill Mccubbine Trustee 01 September 2023
EARLS COLNE RECREATION CHARITY
Recently registered
duncan mccubbine Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
David Cooney ACA Trustee 01 December 2020
EARLS COLNE RECREATION CHARITY
Recently registered
EARLS COLNE HERITAGE MUSEUM
Recently registered