J A ROTH'S CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
distributes income from a capital endowment/other bequeaths to selected charities at the discretion of the Trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 September 1977: Standard registration
- J AND D ROTH'S CHARITABLE SETTLEMENTS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN ROTH | Trustee | 10 December 1995 |
|
|||
RICHARD ANTHONY ROTH | Trustee | 10 December 1995 |
|
|||
DAPHNE MARY LIDDON ROTH | Trustee | 12 March 1970 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £785 | £600 | £705 | £785 | £808 | |
|
Total expenditure | £625 | £607 | £550 | £226 | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27TH MAY 1977
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DDETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 84
North End House
Fitzjames Avenue
London
W14 0RX
- Phone:
- 02076032384
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window