SOUTHEND BACH CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Adult Choir of mixed age, sex and ability. We rehearse weekly and learn choral works which we then perform at 4 public concerts per year. We also undertake concerts for the benefit of other charities, both local and national.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 03 November 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Hugh John Gough FLS | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Stefan Eichenseher | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER WALKER | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARGARET LUXFORD | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARGARET BOX SRN SCMRHV | Trustee | 31 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BARBARA SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN BURFORD CERT ED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.22k | £2.50k | £8.53k | £11.47k | £12.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.22k | £1.02k | £10.84k | £14.62k | £10.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUL 1977 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2004 AS AMENDED ON 21 FEB 2006 AS AMENDED ON 30 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED ON 30 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED ON 11 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, IN PARTICULAR OF MUSIC, AND THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE SOUTHEND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Whitegate Road
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS1 2LQ
- Phone:
- 07503163469
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window